Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Doe John, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Ajayi Akinyemi, Freeman Matthew Garrett, Panish Brian J., against Doe Defendant 1, Doe Defendant 2, Doe Defendant 3, Doe Defendant 4, Doe Defendant 5, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2020 |
CategoryIntentional Infliction Of Emotional Distress (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Order; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: February 27, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice OF HEARING RE: EXISTENCE OF POTENTIALLY RELATED CASES; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Certificate AMENDED MENTAL HEALTH PRACTITIONER’S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Application (FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING RE: EXISTENCE OF POTENTIALLY RELATED CASES) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Certificate (AMENDED MENTAL HEALTH PRACTITIONER?S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING PLAINT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy; Case Management ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOHN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING PLAINT...))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING PLAINT...))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/24/2020)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.