Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Figueroa Jennifer, Hammonds Joshua, Morales Ginger, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian Arby, Aiwazian Edwin, Boyadjian Aram, Zabehi Tara, Cottrell Carolyn Hunt, (total of 7) See All against Porto'S Bakery Buena Park Inc., Porto'S Bakery & Cafe, Porto'S Bakery Downey Inc, Porto'S Bakery Inc., represented by Evans James Robert Jr, Wright Ian A., Owen Kaitlin Hanigan, Wong Kelsey Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1970 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Ginger Morales (Plaintiff)
Date: July 15, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Report - Complex
Date: July 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
April 24, 2023 | Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service | ||
April 24, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
February 22, 2023 | Answer - DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT | ||
January 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
January 20, 2023 | Unknown - SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | ||
January 17, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
January 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Status Conference |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Status Report Joint: As To Parties: | |
January 11, 2023 | Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REMOTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.