Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Campos Paulina, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian Edwin, Zabehi Tara, against Amada Enterprises Inc., View Heights Convalescent Hospital, represented by Lee Loren Geoffrey, Mansukhani Roger Mohan, Wellman Andrew Sean, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Paulina Campos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Paulina Campos (Plaintiff); As to: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Paulina Campos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Appearance and payment of Complex Case Fee; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Complex Designation) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Paulina Campos (Plaintiff); As to: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Order Regarding Related Case; Filed by: Amada Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Paulina Campos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Paulina Campos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (and Payment of Complex Fee)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 09/29/2020)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (and payment of Complex Case Fee)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (Re: 20STCV07994 -Velasquez , 20CMCV00227-Campos)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice (of Order Regarding Related Case)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Initial Status Conference
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.