Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Buchanan Debra, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Qureshi Omar G. Esq., against Charter Communications Inc., Perez Mario, represented by Joffe Steven J., Kaplan Alex, Morris Ashley R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Marie Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Marie Scheper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting Transfer Fees; Filed by: Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Returned Receipt for Transmitted Record - Orange County - 30-202101183259; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 17, 2021Proof of Personal Service Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice (of Posting Transfer Fees) Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgement or Order) Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Returned Receipt for Transmitted Record - Orange County - 30-202101183259 Filed by Clerk
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Payment of Transfer Fees by ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgement or Order) Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: April 13, 2021Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (.) Filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Mario Perez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice (Entry of Judgement or Order) Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Reproduced Court Documents Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Debra Buchanan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (.)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice (of Posting Transfer Fees)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Reproduced Court Documents
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Payment of Transfer Fees by ...))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgement or Order)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice (Entry of Judgement or Order)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (notice of electronic service)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.