Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Campos Jorge, Ramirez Jose Barajas, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Echevarria Joseph Michael, Nguyen Kim, Nguyen Kim Nga N., Payne Cody Lee, Williams Robert Evan, (total of 5) See All against American Qualified Builders Inc., represented by Alberts Jeremy Jon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lawrence P. Riff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLawrence P. Riff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: American Qualified Builders Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Joint Initial status Conference Statement; Filed by: Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Joint Status Report; Filed by: Jorge Campos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Jorge Campos (Plaintiff); Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Cody Lee Payne (Attorney)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Cody Lee Payne (Attorney)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Jorge Campos (Plaintiff); Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint) Filed by American Qualified Builders Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by American Qualified Builders Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Joint Initial status Conference Statement Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Statement Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Jose Barajas Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by American Qualified Builders Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Joint Initial status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Joint Further Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.