Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ocean Avenue Santa Monica Realty Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Terra Ocean Ave Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Morales Edward, against Ocean Avenue Santa Monica Realty Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Dennis Esq Marissa M, Dennis Marissa, Dennis Marissa M., Kenney Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order re Court's Order on Motion to appoint Appraiser hearing held ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Court Order for Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Witness List Joint; Filed by: Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Edward Morales (Attorney)
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Exhibit List Joint; Filed by: Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ocean Avenue Santa Monica Realty, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Court Order for Demurrers and Motion for Preliminary Injunction hearing held Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Order (re Court's Order on Motion to appoint Appraiser hearing held ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other Uphold C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine Plaintiff's 2-5 and Defendant's #1)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Witness List (Joint) Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference re Non-Jury Trial for Declaratory Re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to the First A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Ame...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint) Filed by Terra Ocean Ave, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other for Appointment of Third Appraiser)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Court Order for Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARISSA M. DENNIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF THIRD APPRAISER)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction (or in the Alternative Stay of Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Steve Mlynarcyk in Support of Preliminary Injunction or Stay of Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR APPOINTMENT OF THIRD APPRAISER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Reply (Ocean Avenue Santa Monica Realty LLCs Reply in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Court Order for Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other for Appointment of Third Appraiser))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Order (re Court's Order on Motion to appoint Appraiser hearing held )
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Summons (on 1st Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRADLEY E. LOFGREN, MAI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF THIRD APPRAISER)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...) of )
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Court Order for Demurrers and Motion for Preliminary Injunction hearing held
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Ocean Avenue Santa Monica Realty LLC's list of fie proposed appraisers)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to S...) of )
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice (and Request for Court to Confirm Cary Bronstein as Third Appraiser)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Morales in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to S...))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing and Order)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to the First A...) of )
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of )
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of )
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing Date on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Yolanda Tanner, CSR #12785))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to the First A...))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Mo...))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of )
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 (TO EXCLUDE PAROL EVIDENCE))
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Any Testimony by Kenneth L. Friedman - No. 5)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Unredacted Copies of Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine Plaintiff's 2-5 and Defendant's #1))
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Ame...))
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Appraisers Appointed - No. 1)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Expert Opinions re Income)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Witness List (Joint)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Marissa M. Dennis in Support of Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Valuations)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Citation of Unpublished Authority in Trial Brief)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Ame...) of )
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Parol evidence - No. 2)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 to Preclude Appraisers Experts Opinions)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARISSA M. DENNIS)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 (TO EXCLUDE APPRAISERS' EXPERTS' OPINIONS))
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 (TO EXCLUDE APPRAISERS))
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Mo...) of )
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Unredacted Trial Brief)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 (TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINIONS RE INCOME APPROACH))
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of its Motions in Limine No 2-4)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR APPOINTMENT OF THIRD APPRAISER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRADLEY E. LOFGREN, MAI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF THIRD APPRAISER)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Morales in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Order (re Court's Order on Motion to appoint Appraiser hearing held 11/20/20)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other for Appointment of Third Appraiser))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/24/2020)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to S...))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction (or in the Alternative Stay of Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Ocean Avenue Santa Monica Realty LLC's list of fie proposed appraisers)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Steve Mlynarcyk in Support of Preliminary Injunction or Stay of Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/12/2021)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (and Request for Court to Confirm Cary Bronstein as Third Appraiser)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/23/2021)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing and Order)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/03/2021)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint) of 06/10/2021)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 07/06/2021)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Summons (on 1st Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to the First A...))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date) of 10/15/2021)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARISSA M. DENNIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF THIRD APPRAISER)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint) of )
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Parties Agreement to Appoint Cary Bronstein MAI as Third Appraiser)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Terra Ocean Ave, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Parties Agreement to Appoint Cary Bronstein MAI as Third Appraiser)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Court Order for Demurrers and Motion for Preliminary Injunction hearing held 2/23/21
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Terra Ocean Ave, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Reply (Ocean Avenue Santa Monica Realty LLCs Reply in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.