Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arch Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ferber Brian J., Smith Jay W., against Day & Nite Forklift Inc., Sika Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Brief CASE SUMMARY; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Default entered as to Day & Nite Forklift, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Arch Insurance Company on
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Declaration RE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Default entered as to Day & Nite Forklift, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Arch Insurance Company on
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Default entered as to Day & Nite Forklift, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Arch Insurance Company on
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: February 01, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: February 03, 2023Declaration RE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Brief CASE SUMMARY; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 06, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/09/2021
Date: March 09, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION RE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: April 30, 2021Brief - BRIEF CASE SUMMARY
Date: April 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: June 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 03, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/03/2021
Date: August 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/23/2021
Date: August 23, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 10, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 15 - NOT ENTERED
Date: November 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION RE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: November 30, 2021Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: November 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: February 01, 2022Judgment
Date: February 01, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement ((by Plaintiff))
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration (RE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/03/2021)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 to 15)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 to 15 - NOT ENTERED)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Sika Corporation)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (RE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/23/2021)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/09/2021)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/09/2021)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Brief (CASE SUMMARY)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Brief (CASE SUMMARY)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 12/01/2021)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 09, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: March 09, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 15
Date: April 30, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.