Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Johnson E. Samuel Iii, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Johnson E. Samuel Iii, against Garcia John, Garcia Peter, Yamini Negin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard L. Fruin, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Fruin, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryTortious Interference (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: John Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Ruling on Demurrers of Defendants' Peter and John Garcia to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Peter Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Exhibit List AMENDED; Filed by: Peter Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Peter Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Peter Garcia (Defendant); John Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Peter Garcia (Defendant); John Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EZEDRICK SAMUEL JOHNSON, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Peter Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration Supplemental Declaration in Support of her Demurrer; Filed by: Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: John Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference (CMC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 05, 2023Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 04, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference (CMC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: John Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Peter Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: John Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference (FSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Plaintiff's Exhibit List) Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Defts Peter Garcia and Joh...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Ruling on Demurrers of Defendants' Peter and John Garcia to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Witness List (- Plaintiff's Witness List) Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Negin Yamini (Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel by Atty Negin Yam...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Plaintiff's Exhibit List) Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Negin Yamini (Attorney)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration in Support of her Demurrer) Filed by Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (To The Demurrer of Defendant John Garcia to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (To The Demurrer of Defendant Negin Yamini to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (To The Demurrer of Defendant Peter Garcia to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Ruling on Demurrers of Defendants' Peter and John Garcia to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike by Deft Negin ...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration in Support of her Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer (- Defendants Peter Garcia and John Garcia's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Plaintiff's Exhibit List)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Witness List (- Plaintiff's Witness List)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Trial Brief (- Plaintiff's Trial Brief)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference (FSC)))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Defendants Peter Garcia and John Garcia's Exhibit List)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Plaintiff's Exhibit List)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Defendants Peter Garcia and John Garcia's Amended Exhibit List)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Memorandum (- Status Conference Re: Memorandum: Liens, Settlement Agreement, Attorneys Fees and Costs)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Defts Peter Garcia and Joh...))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (FSC)))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike by Deft Negin ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Trial Brief (- Plaintiff's Trial Brief) Filed by E. Samuel Johnson, III (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (FSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Peter Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Negin Yamini (Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Negin Yamini (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Peter Garcia (Defendant); John Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.