Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gordon Gayle R., Rashad Averell Ursery A Minor By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem Gayle R. Gordon, Special Olympics Southern California Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Nalbandyan Arutyun Harry, against City Of Los Angeles, Claude Morris, Special Olympics Southern California Inc., represented by Hutchinson Adam A., Rawlins Charlynn Kunz, Shikibu Margaret, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: August 02, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: May 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: June 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: August 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DENYING EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROM...)
Date: September 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 12, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: January 13, 2023Order - Dismissal
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 18, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 20, 2023Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Ex...))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Rashad)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (To Plaintiff's Complaint;)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.) of 06/09/2021)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Adam A. Hutchinson)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order to Minute Order dated 3/1/2021 to correct...))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.