Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wanhoo Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ramseyer Craig A., Wu Lianlian Alan, against Sj44 Development Llc, Wang Anna, Zou Vincent, represented by Dickson Robert, Dickson Robert M., Von Esch Iv Robert A., Von Esch Robert A. Iv, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth R. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: SJ44 Development LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: SJ44 Development LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION TO QUASH; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vincent Zou (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Response TO DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT (MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA); Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Reply To Opposition to Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: SJ44 Development LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SJ44 Development LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Order Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Declaration IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Objection To Declaration of Yang; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Robert M. Dickson (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Wanhoo LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Response (TO DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT (MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the Hearing on Motion...) of )
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;) of )
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Objection (TO DECLARATION OF SCOTT R. OMOHUNDRO IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of )
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order Re: Non-Complex Determination
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, WANHOO LLC, FOR TEMPORARY ...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Demurrer)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proofs of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order Re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Reply (TO WANHOO LLC'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WANHOO LLC)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of )
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WANHOO LLC)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One [Res. ID: 5854])
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Response (TO DEFENDANT?S SEPARATE STATEMENT (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Order (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Objection (To Declaration of Yang)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogator...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;) of 10/13/2020)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Demurrer)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, WANHOO LLC, FOR TEMPORARY ...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WANHOO LLC)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Reply (TO WANHOO LLC'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WANHOO LLC)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Objection (To Declaration of Yang)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Objection (TO DECLARATION OF SCOTT R. OMOHUNDRO IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Order (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Response (TO DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT (MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Response (TO DEFENDANT?S SEPARATE STATEMENT (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 05/18/2021)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One [Res. ID: 5854])
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Declaration of David V. Luu; Filed by: Vincent Zou (Defendant); Anna Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.