Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kim Steve, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Citimortgage Inc., Citimortgage Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Citimortgage Inc. A New York Corporation, Cr Title Services Co Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association, (total of 10) See All represented by Peterson Christopher, Peterson Christopher Lee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Malcolm H. Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMalcolm H. Mackey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Steve Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steve Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Steve Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Steve Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: January 03, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Affidavit of Prejudice Peremptory Challenge To ...))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF CHRISTOPHER L. PETERSON IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.