Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jeong Terry Gyeong, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Marlis Brent Philip, Park Young K., against A-Ju Tours Inc., Bahk Daniel Pyoung Aka Pyoung Sik Bak, Bahk Hanmi, Bahk Helen Young, Bahk Henry H, (total of 6) See All represented by Bahk Henry H, Florence Barry G., Watts Michael R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kevin C. Brazile presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin C. Brazile Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Default entered as to HANMI BAHK; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DANIEL PYOUNG BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00; Default not entered as to HENRY H BAHK; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Default entered as to A-JU TOURS, INC. On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Default entered as to HENRY H BAHK; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00; Default not entered as to HANMI BAHK; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Default entered as to HELEN YOUNG BAHK; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Default entered as to DANIEL PYOUNG BAHK; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Default entered as to MUTUAL TRANS, INC. On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG on
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: MUTUAL TRANS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: HENRY H BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Notice of Motion & Motion to Consolidate Cases; Filed by: A-JU TOURS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: A-JU TOURS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hanmie Bak Erroneously Sued As HANMI BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: HELEN YOUNG BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DANIEL PYOUNG BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Dismissal without Prejudice)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service (non service report) Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by HELEN YOUNG BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Motion & Motion to Consolidate Cases) Filed by A-JU TOURS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by A-JU TOURS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by MUTUAL TRANS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgement or Response)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected) Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hanmie Bak Erroneously Sued As HANMI BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference [BINDING])) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected) Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by HENRY H BAHK (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by TERRY GYEONG JEONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service (non service report)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE: ARBITRATION)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation And Order For Relief)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgement or Response))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/13/2021)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service (non service report)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.