Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Troshchiy Law Firm, Troshchiy Law Firm A Professional Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Karpel Donald, Karpel Donald E., against Marchiondo Philip Lorin, Russell Doison, The Meridian Law Group Inc. A California Coropration, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., represented by Marchiondo Phillip L., Wenrick Courtney C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Donald Karpel (Attorney)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Court Order for Demurrer and Motion to Dismiss hearing held ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer; Filed by: Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 05, 2023Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Filed by: Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Troshchiy Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: April 17, 2023Case Management Statement Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint) Filed by Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint) Filed by Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer) Filed by Doison Russell (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Troshchiy Law Firm, a Professional Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Donald Karpel (Attorney)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; Hearing on Demurrer - without...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Court Order for Demurrer and Motion to Dismiss hearing held Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO RUSSELL MOTION TO DISMISS; DECLARATION OF DONALD E. KARPEL)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY RUSSELL)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurringor Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION BY PLAINTIFF?S COUNSEL RE: DEMURRER BY RUSSELL)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Court Order for Demurrer and Motion to Dismiss hearing held 2/25/21
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; Hearing on Demurrer - without...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Donald E. Karpel Re: Post-Arbitration)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.