Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lee Hee Soo, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fraser Ira, Karpeles Jack H., Karpeles Jack Howard, against Oh Hyun, represented by Oh Hyun, Oh John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Crowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 28, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2020Complaint
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Exhibit List Exhibits in Support of Reply to Opposition; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge filed by Hee Soo Lee (Pla...)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition; Verification; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant); As to: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Opposition to motion to compel responses; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Opposition defendant's opposition to motion for reconsideration; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Appellant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (re c.c.p. ¿2016.040) Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Declaration Declaration in Support of Reply to Opposition; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant); As to: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration re c.c.p. ¿2016.040; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order of Dismissal - With Prejudice]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Reconsideration: Filed By: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Order of Dismissal - With Prejudice; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant); As to: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B316068); Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order of Dismissal - With Prejudice]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in Support of Reply to Opposition) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel responses) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Appellant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge filed by Hee Soo Lee (Pla...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Opposition (defendant's opposition to motion for reconsideration) Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition; Verification) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Exhibit List (Exhibits in Support of Reply to Opposition) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Reconsideration) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant's Motion for Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (Form for Personal Injury Courts) Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Appellant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Order (of Dismissal - With Prejudice) Filed by Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hyun Oh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Hee Soo Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed ((B316068)) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 12/02/2020)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Hee Soo Lee in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel responses)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge filed by Hee Soo Lee (Pla...))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (re c.c.p. ¿2016.040)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Jack H. Karpeles in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (defendant's opposition to motion for reconsideration)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order of Dismissal - With Prejudice])
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Order (of Dismissal - With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion t...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (Form for Personal Injury Courts)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant's Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in Support of Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Exhibit List (Exhibits in Support of Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition; Verification)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.