Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thomas Steven Dwayne, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobson Kevin Y., against General Motors Llc, represented by Davis Stacey S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica Bachner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management112 days |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 27, 2020Complaint
Date: August 27, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 28, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 31, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 19, 2020Answer
Date: December 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: August 02, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/02/2021
Date: August 02, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Settlement Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Steven Dwayne Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.