Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Doe John, filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Hathaway Mark M., against The Trustees Of The California State University, The Trustees Of The California State University A California Corporation, White Timothy P., represented by Hsu William C., Hsu William Casey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2020 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration Declaration of John Doe2 In Support of Declaratory Relief; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Hearing on Writ Petition; Briefing Schedule; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Gail Killefer, Dept. 37; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Reply Opposition to Stay; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Administrative Record and Joint Appendix; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 01, 2022Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Brief Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Non-Jury Trial; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Brief Opening Brief in Support of Writ of Mandate; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule; Signed and Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TRO and OSC re Preliminary He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Res...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Stay of Administrative Order ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (Case Reassignment to Dept 82) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Stay of Administrative Order or Decision) Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (Order re Withdrawal of Ex Parte on ) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Stay of Administrative Order an d Decision) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Jury Trial) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Gail Killefer, Dept. 37) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, TO STAY ADMINISTRA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Writ Petition; Briefing Schedule) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of John Doe2 In Support of Declaratory Relief) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Brief (Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, TO STAY ADMINIS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Opening Brief in Support of Writ of Mandate Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continuing Hearing and Briefing) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Administrative Record and Joint Appendix) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Reply (Opposition to Stay) Filed by John Doe (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice (Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Res...))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Stay of Administrative Order or Decision)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Stay of Administrative Order ...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re: Filing Defendants' Answer)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Stay of Administrative Order an d Decision)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Writ Petition; Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Court))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Stay of Operation of Administrative Order)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (Order re Withdrawal of Ex Parte on )
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Susan Westover in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Susan Westover in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Stay)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of )
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Court) of )
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, TO STAY ADMINIS...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Opening Brief in Support of Writ of Mandate
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Lee Mintz in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TRO and OSC re Preliminary He...))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice (Case Reassignment to Dept 82)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, TO STAY ADMINISTRA...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Reply (Opposition to Stay)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Trial Brief in Opposition to Petition for Writ
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Answer (to Verified First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continuing Hearing and Briefing)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Administrative Record and Joint Appendix)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TRO and OSC re Preliminary He...))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Res...))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, TO STAY ADMINISTRA...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice (Order re Withdrawal of Ex Parte on 9/23/2020)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Stay of Administrative Order ...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/23/2020)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, TO STAY ADMINIS...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Court))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Stay of Administrative Order or Decision)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice (Case Reassignment to Dept 82)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: FILING OF DEFENDANTS? ANSWER AND WESTOVER DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF LODGING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND JOINT APPENDIX)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Opposition (Respondents' Trial Brief in Opposition to Petition for Writ)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing and Briefing)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Brief (REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Brief (Opening Brief in Support of Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Writ Petition; Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Reply (Opposition to Stay)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continue Hearing and Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Stay of Administrative Order an d Decision)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.