Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Segal Stephanie, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Hood Marqui, against Bradshaw Lena, Providence Saint Joseph Health And Services Southern California, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management99 days |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 25, 2020Complaint
Date: August 25, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Stephanie Segal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Stephanie Segal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Stephanie Segal (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Stephanie Segal (Plaintiff)
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/02/2020)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.