Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Koltes Assunta, Koltes Mark, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dolin Tionna, Rabieian Debora, against General Motors Llc, represented by Bracken Roger R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Case Management Order]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Case Management Order]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Assunta Koltes (Plaintiff); Mark Koltes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC?S HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.