Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Florentino Moises, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sabarwal Sanjay, against Good People Coffee Co., represented by Cabanday Orlando F., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: June 09, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Declaration CASE Summary; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF AMENDED CASE SUMMARY; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF AMENDED CASE SUMMARY; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Declaration AMENDED DECLARATION OF SANJAY SABARWAL; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Declaration Amended Declaration of Moises Florentino; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff); As to: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Sanjay Sabarwal; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Moises Florentino; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant); As to: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Application APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGEMENT; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration Amended Declaration of Sanjay Sabarwal; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Request Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Moises Florentino; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Default entered as to Good People Coffee Co. On the Complaint filed by Moises Florentino on
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Declaration AMENDED DECLARATION OF MOISES FLORENTINO; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Declaration Third Amended Declaration of Sanjay Sabarwal; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff); As to: Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Updated -- Answer: Filed By: Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant); Result: Stricken; Result Date:
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff); As to: Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: May 03, 2023Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Moises Florentino (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Orlando F. Cabanday (Attorney)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Continuance - Court Unavailable)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Good People Coffee Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Default Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Application (APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGEMENT) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Answer and Enter Defendant's Default)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Request (Request for Dismissal) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED DECLARATION OF SANJAY SABARWAL) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Application (APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGEMENT) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Application (APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGEMENT) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (CASE Summary) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF AMENDED CASE SUMMARY) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (Amended Declaration of Sanjay Sabarwal) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (Amended Declaration of Moises Florentino) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Moises Florentino) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Default Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Moises Florentino) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF AMENDED CASE SUMMARY) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (Third Amended Declaration of Sanjay Sabarwal) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED DECLARATION OF MOISES FLORENTINO) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sanjay Sabarwal) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Filing of Default Judgment Packet)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Application (Application for Court Judgement) Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Moises Florentino (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Continuance - Court Unavailable) of )
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Continuance - Court Unavailable))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment))
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Application (Application for Court Judgement)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Answer and Enter Defendant's Default))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF AMENDED CASE SUMMARY)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sanjay Sabarwal)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED DECLARATION OF SANJAY SABARWAL)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED DECLARATION OF MOISES FLORENTINO)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment))
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Default Judgment) of )
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Filing of Default Judgment Packet))
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Application (APPLICATION FOR COURT JUDGEMENT)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (CASE Summary)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Moises Florentino)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Continuance - Court Unavailable))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Answer and Enter Defendant's Default))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.