Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perez Genesis, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dolin Tionna Grace, against Nissan North America Inc., represented by Sweeney Michael P, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen Duffy-Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 21, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant); As to: Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Clerk; Judge Name: Maureen Duffy-Lewis
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Genesis Perez (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Tionna Grace Dolin (Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Tionna Grace Dolin (Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference) Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: April 05, 2022Complaint Filed by Genesis Perez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge;))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.