Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Montes Yasmin E., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Beck Benjeman, against General Motors Llc, represented by Roybal Kyle B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 19, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2020Complaint
Date: August 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: June 09, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 14, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-11-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Yasmin E. Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Confer...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Confer...))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/22/2021)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.