Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alor Victor, Argueta Rosario, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Yashar Nadia, against Cerritos Nissan, Nissan North America Inc., represented by Sweeney Michael P, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ROSARIO ARGUETA (Plaintiff); VICTOR ALOR (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00; Default not entered as to CERRITOS NISSAN; On the Complaint filed by ROSARIO ARGUETA, et al. on
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 28, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 09/08/2020)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/30/2021)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.