Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Flaming Music Productions Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Kernan Stephen Michael, against Epic Rights Llc A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Gutierrez Robert S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 18, 2020Complaint
Date: August 18, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 13, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by Epic Rights, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Flaming Music Productions, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Flaming Music Productions, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Flaming Music Productions, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Flaming Music Productions, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT EPIC RIGHTS, LLC TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Declaration (of RSG ISO Demurrer)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.