Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Velasquez Geovanni, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yashar Nadia, against Camino Real Chevrolet, General Motors Llc, represented by Arens-Mcbride Mary Lynn, Dao Vanessa, Roybal Kyle B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management83 days |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Complaint
Date: August 18, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 18, 2020Default entered as to CAMINO REAL CHEVROLET; On the Complaint filed by GEOVANNI VELASQUEZ on
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant); As to: GEOVANNI VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CAMINO REAL CHEVROLET (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: GEOVANNI VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: GEOVANNI VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: CAMINO REAL CHEVROLET (Defendant); As to: GEOVANNI VELASQUEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order Disclosure and Order; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 28, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: May 02, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed by Camino Real Chevrolet (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Camino Real Chevrolet (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Status Conference re: Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re lodge trial binders; Status Con...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Geovanni Velasquez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Status Conference re: Settlement))
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference; Status Conference re: Settlement) of )
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re lodge trial binders; Status Con...))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 11/09/2020)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/07/2020)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re lodge trial binders; Status Con...))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.