Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carrillo Imelda Galan, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Partiyeli Jacob O., against Leonardo Apartments, Long Beach Affordable Housing Coalition Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Imelda Galan Carrillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Imelda Galan Carrillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Imelda Galan Carrillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 06/25/2021)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.