Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Min Yunhee, Tolkin Peter L., filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Bennett Michael Richard, against Bernard Michael Jr., Bernard Michael Sr., Does 1 To 100 Inclusive, Garber Vlad S., Konstruct Inc., (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2020 |
CategoryConstruction Defect (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 17, 2020Complaint
Date: August 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: February 10, 2021Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 02/10/2021)
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference))
Date: December 11, 2020Complaint
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference) of 12/11/2020)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.