Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Fields Kincy, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Nava Alfredo, against Ghp Management Corporation, Manusevitz Dori T., Warner Center Summit Ltd. Dba Summit At Warner Center, represented by Anz Andrea, Anz Andrea J, Hitch Dave, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Reply to defendant's opposition; Filed by: Kincy Fields (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: GHP Management Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Kincy Fields (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of outstanding issues; Filed by: Kincy Fields (Plaintiff); As to: Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of court order; Filed by: Kincy Fields (Plaintiff); As to: Warner Center Summit LTD. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of order; Filed by: Kincy Fields (Plaintiff); As to: Warner Center Summit LTD. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Reply to plaintiff's opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Setting of Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Taking Motions Off-Calendar) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: August 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: September 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 29, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER
Date: December 03, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 12, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 19, 2021Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 16, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: April 16, 2021Answer
Date: April 16, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF OUTSTANDING ISSUES
Date: July 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 10, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 30, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 30, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: April 19, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: April 20, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: April 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TAKING MOTIONS OFF-CALENDAR)
Date: April 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 19, 2022Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION
Date: May 11, 2023Answer Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by GHP Management Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Taking Motions Off-Calendar) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of ex-parte application) Filed by Kincy Fields (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Warner Center Summit LTD. (Defendant); GHP Management Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by GHP Management Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting of Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice (of court order) Filed by Kincy Fields (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Taking Motions Off-Calendar)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Reply (to plaintiff's opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Kincy Fields (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Dori T. Manusevitz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Notice (of outstanding issues) Filed by Kincy Fields (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TOLL PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice (of order) Filed by Kincy Fields (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting of Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mekigh)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mekigh)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TOLL PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CO...))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Abriona)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)))
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting of Status Conference) of )
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Abriona)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mekigh)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (of order)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Abriona)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting of Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice (of court order)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF OUTSTANDING ISSUES FOR THE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Taking Motions Off-Calendar))
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Taking Motions Off-Calendar) of )
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Reply (to plaintiff's opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRI...))
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice (of ex-parte application)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice (of outstanding issues)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and all related deadlines)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Abriona)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Abriona)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mekigh)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Abriona)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mekigh)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mekigh)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice (of order)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference) of 10/29/2020)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TOLL PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CO...))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting of Status Conference) of 01/10/2022)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting of Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice (of ex-parte application)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of outstanding issues)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference) of 01/19/2021)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply (to plaintiff's opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.