Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lanza Jonathon Michael, Lanza Katie Renee, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dolin Tionna, Gibson Mark William, against American Honda Motor Co. Inc., represented by Echegaray Linda R, Echegaray Linda R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jonathon Michael Lanza (Plaintiff); Katie Renee Lanza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jonathon Michael Lanza (Plaintiff); Katie Renee Lanza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jonathon Michael Lanza (Plaintiff); Katie Renee Lanza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 12, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 2020Complaint
Date: August 12, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 03, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 10, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 14, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: December 15, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER;)
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 17, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: April 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 26, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 27, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: June 25, 2021Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: June 30, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 30, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: July 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 10, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: November 19, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Reply (AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF UN-OPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;) of 01/15/2021)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.