Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chet Needelman Trustee Of The Needelman #1 Revocable Intervivos Trust, Michael Bennett Trustee Of The Bennett Living Trust U A 3 12 92, Hamilton John, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ibisi Eric Okwudili, against Bennett Michael, Doe 1 Needleman, Doe 2 Bennett, Needleman Chet, represented by Burton Steven E, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management99 days |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 10, 2020Complaint
Date: August 10, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 10, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: August 24, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: December 08, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 08, 2020Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: March 15, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES MICHAEL BENNETT,
Date: March 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 22, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 13, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CMC
Date: April 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: May 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 13, 2021Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 26, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 26, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: August 26, 2021Answer
Date: August 26, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION AND DECLARATION OF STEVEN E. ...)
Date: September 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 04, 2021Answer
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 21, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN E. BURTON IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: November 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 15, 2021Case Management Order
Date: November 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANTS FAIL...)
Date: November 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: December 16, 2021Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: January 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/20/2022
Date: January 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND CRO...)
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: September 20, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: November 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: November 23, 2022Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CINDY MARTIN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Order RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to file proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for plaintiff's failure to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Amended Ex Application of of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Order to Sho...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Opposition (to OSC re Sanctions for failure to appear at CMC) Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for entry of default; Case ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to file his late Opposition ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CINDY MARTIN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by CINDY MARTIN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Declaration of Steven E. ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Declaration of Steven E. ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Mediation Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for cross-complainants fail...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions plaintiff's counsel and Cro...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses MOTIO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st)) Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Cross-defendants failur...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 07, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Declaration of Steven E. ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to file proof o...))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (Michael Bennett,)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (to OSC re Sanctions for failure to appear at CMC)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for entry of default; Case ...))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for plaintiff's failure to ...))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Declaration of Steven E. ...))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to file his late Opposition ...))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Order to Sho...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Amended Ex Application of of ...))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for cross-complainants fail...))
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Separate Statement (FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses MOTIO...))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Cross-defendants failur...))
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven E. Burton in Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff); As to: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff); As to: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Opposition to OSC re Sanctions for failure to appear at CMC; Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Michael Bennett (Defendant); As to: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by:
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Summons on Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); As to: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Chet Needleman (Defendant); Michael Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Post-Mediation Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Doe 1 Needleman (Defendant); Doe 2 Bennett (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: JOHN HAMILTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.