Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Safeco Insurance Company Of America, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Villalta Fredy, represented by Wang Christina Emily, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCO...)
Date: December 15, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motions to Compel Further Disco...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Petition (Petition to Open Case re Uninsured Motorist Arbitration)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motions to Compel Further Disco...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.