Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Weinstein Hayley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greenberg David H, Greenberg David H Esq., Ruby Emily A., Ruby Emily A. Esq., Munro Elizabeth C., (total of 6) See All against Glover Henry Arthur, Glover William, represented by Keshishian Natalie Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 05, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2020Complaint
Date: August 05, 2020PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Henry Arthur Glover (Defendant); William Glover (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Henry Arthur Glover (Defendant); William Glover (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application , Filed by Plaintiff, To Shor...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application , Filed by Plaintiff, To Shor...)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Henry Arthur Glover (Defendant); William Glover (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Henry Arthur Glover (Defendant); William Glover (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Henry Arthur Glover (Defendant); William Glover (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Hayley Weinstein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application , Filed by Plaintiff, To Shor...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.