Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Paterson John, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frisardi Thomas, Mancini Michael, against Early 911S Registry Inc., Hammond Michael, Miller Chuck, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint
Date: August 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 03, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 03, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 04, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 10, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 11, 2020Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: October 26, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 12, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS
Date: December 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE (TIMOTHY CLEVEL...)
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 12, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 26, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 01, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 14, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: June 16, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: October 19, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: October 20, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: March 06, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Updated -- Order [Proposed] Order: Filed By: John Paterson (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 20, 2022Order [Proposed] Order; Signed and Filed by: John Paterson (Plaintiff); As to: John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 19, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Separate Statement ((5369)) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Austin H. Krist) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Timothy Clevel...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Separate Statement ((6425)) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Timothy Cleveland) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Separate Statement ((1521)) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: October 20, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: October 19, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by John Paterson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses s by ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Chuck Miller (Defendant)
Date: October 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Separate Statement ((1521))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Timothy Cleveland)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (of Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Austin H. Krist))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Austin H. Krist)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Defendant Chuck Miller (6425))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (y Defendant Michael Hammond (5369))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement ((5369))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Timothy Clevel...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of No Opposition to Verified Pro Hac Vice Applications)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Defendant Early 911S Registry (1521))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (of Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Timothy Cleveland))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement ((6425))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents by Defendant Early 911S Registry)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses s by ...))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents by Defendant Chuck Miller)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents by Defendant Michael Hammond)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.