Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Medina Jaime, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Brown Daniel J, Surls Ethan Capell, against Allcare Medical Management Inc. A California Corporation, Family Planning Associates Medical Group Inc. A California Corporation, Garcia Marie, Solis Julie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark V. Mooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/04/2020)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration and Stay Further Proceedings)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.