Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Long Marseliana Handoyo, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Schelly Thomas Henry Esq., against Gallegos Mario Romero, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: MARIO ROMERO GALLEGOS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO ROMERO GALLEGOS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: MARIO ROMERO GALLEGOS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Personal Injury Hub) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MARIO ROMERO GALLEGOS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 31, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 31, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 31, 2020Complaint
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 11, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 16, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: October 13, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE
Date: October 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB)
Date: October 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: October 26, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: March 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL
Date: April 05, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 12, 2021Notice (Notice of Reassignment) Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by MARIO ROMERO GALLEGOS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to the Personal Injury Hub) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: May 12, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Court
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement ((conditional)) Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by MARSELIANA HANDOYO LONG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Personal Injury Hub)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/13/2020)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Reassignment)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to the Personal Injury Hub) of 10/16/2020)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference; Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 12/04/2020)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Personal Injury Hub))
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.