Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of The West A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Olson Shawn, against Pedraja Marco Franco, Pedraja Mary June, Pedraja Nonylon, represented by Pedraja Gino Paolo Almosara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen Duffy-Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Bank of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bank of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bank of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Marco Franco Pedraja (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 31, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 31, 2020Complaint
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 31, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 01, 2020Answer
Date: September 16, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2021Case Management Order
Date: January 28, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 28, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.