Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hernandez Bianka, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Salamati Sean F. Esq., against City Of Thousand Oaks, Conejo Recreation And Park District, County Of Ventura, Horizon Autos, Lyft Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Haas Todd R., Kruska Lara M., Kruska Lara Margaret, Lopez Laura G, Lopez Laura G. Esq., (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael E. Whitaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Emilio Eusebio Padron (Defendant); As to: Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: County of Ventura (Defendant); As to: Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 26, 2021Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Emilio Eusebio Padron (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: City of Thousand Oaks (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order: Motion to Transfer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Trial Attorney; Filed by: Emilio Eusebio Padron (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Thousand Oaks (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by County of Ventura (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation For Change of Venue and Order) Filed by Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Emilio Eusebio Padron (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: Motion to Transfer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Emilio Eusebio Padron (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Conejo Recreation and Park District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Motion to Transfer) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Reproduced Court Documents Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Answer (and Demand for Jury Trial) Filed by Horizon Autos (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Trial Attorney) Filed by Emilio Eusebio Padron (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Thousand Oaks (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue; Hearing on Motion to T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue Filed by City of Thousand Oaks (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Bianka Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Answer (and Demand for Jury Trial)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: Motion to Transfer))
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Motion to Transfer) of 12/28/2020)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Trial Attorney)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.