Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Taylor Louisa, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Goel Sami, against Af1 Partners Lp Dba Au Fudge, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2020 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 30, 2020Complaint
Date: July 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sami Goel (Attorney)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND PROOF OF FU...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Proof of Fundi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Sami Goel (Attorney)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION TO PROVIDE PROOF OF FUNDING)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Marni)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS PROOF OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY AS PER COURTS ORDER)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND PROOF OF FU...))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice (of OSC re Dismissal/Settlement)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.