Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Randall Manufacturing Llc, Target Corporation, Transportation Commodities Inc., Wyatt Eric, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Montevideo John A., against Randall Manufacturing Llc, Target Corporation, Tk Services Inc. Dba Thermo King Services A California Corporation, Transportation Commodities Inc., represented by Baratta James M, Halm David, Siepler James E., Trachtman Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer
Date: September 02, 2020Declaration OF ALFRED M. PETTINGER; Filed by: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Case Transfer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant); As to: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Remand Order Filed April 9, 2021;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff); As to: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff); As to: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant); As to: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff); As to: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Target Corporation, an Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Summons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant); As to: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Target Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Federal Removal or a Remand Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Remand Order Filed April 9, 2021;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name ((AMENDED)) Filed by Transportation Commodities, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Summons (On Cross-Complaint) Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL AND RELATED DATES Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Target Corporation, an Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Remand Order Filed April 9, 2021;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF ALFRED M. PETTINGER) Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Target Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing Date on D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Case Transfer) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing Hearing D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF ERICA WYATT'S NOTICE OF DISMISSED CASE) Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Randall Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Case Transfer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Target Corporation, an Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Eric Wyatt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court;) of 10/01/2020)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court;))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Federal Removal or a Remand Order;))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.