Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Syal Aman, Syal Amar, The Hollywood Colony 2 Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bui Terri Hong, Harris Charles L., Maggard Jordan M., Raja Kumar S., against Syal Aman, Syal Amar, represented by Lee Henry M., Phillips Thomas M., Wright Adam Alan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Certificate OF COMPLIANCE; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Summons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); As to: Aman Syal (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Order Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate (OF COMPLIANCE) Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Order (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Aman Syal (Cross-Complainant); Amar Syal (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion) Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike) Filed by Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alex Blarek (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference (Mediation Completion Date))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Aman Syal (Defendant); Amar Syal (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Henry Lee ISO Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference (Mediation Completion Date)))
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Order (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Dismiss Aman Syal and Amar Syal's Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate (OF COMPLIANCE)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel for the Hollywood Colony 2)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of New Hearing Date on The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate (OF COMPLIANCE)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel for the Hollywood Colony 2)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Dismiss Aman Syal and Amar Syal's Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Henry Lee ISO Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of New Hearing Date on The Hollywood Colony 2, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.