Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company Llc. A Delaware Llc, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Hurwitz Daniel S., against Bijan Radnia As Trustee Of The Radnia Revocable Trust Dated July 1 2009, Carson-Wilmington Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Kanooni Kevin Y, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheresa M. Traber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management101 days |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief Only (Not Domestic/Harassment) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Complaint
Date: July 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 27, 2020Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing - Other on Defendant's ri...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (In Response To Order)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Kenneth P. Roberts Re OSC Re Failure to Appear)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (Further Declaration in Anticipation)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continuing Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary ...))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Affidavit (Affidavit of Due Diligence)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Kenneth P. Roberts Re OSC Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continuing Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.