Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jang Charles, Suh Amy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Johnson Amanda, against Gulf Coast Enviroshield Llc A Texas Corporation, Singleton Rebecca J., represented by Olson Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management97 days |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Amy Suh (Plaintiff); Charles Jang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 12, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amy Suh (Plaintiff); Charles Jang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Amy Suh (Plaintiff); Charles Jang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 15, 2023Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Amy Suh (Plaintiff); Charles Jang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amy Suh (Plaintiff); Charles Jang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Amy Suh (Plaintiff); Charles Jang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Reclassified to Limited Civil)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.