Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hines Delvin, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Beldner Sabrina A., Bibiyan David D., against Centerra Group Llc, Centerra Services International Inc., Chandless An Individual Michael, Chandless Michael, Constellis Integrated Risk Management Services, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 17, 2020Complaint
Date: July 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PARALLEL FEDERAL PROCEEDING; CASE MANAG...)
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER;)
Date: March 30, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 02, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: March 10, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Constellis Integrated Risk Management Services (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the October 26, 2021 ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Constellis Integrated Risk Management Services (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Hearing on Demurre...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Delvin Hines (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Parallel Federal Proceeding; Case Manag...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Parallel Fe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the August 23, 2022 C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Parallel Fe...))
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Notice (of Change in Counsel for Service List)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Motion to Stay)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;))
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Sabrina A. Belder)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DIEGO AVILES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the October 26, 2021 ...) of )
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Stipulation to continue the October 26, 2021 Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINITFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Parallel Federal Proceeding; Case Manag...))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Sabrina A. Beldner in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order and [proposed] Order Thereon)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Protective Order;) of )
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the October 26, 2021 ...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Hearing on Demurre...))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Sabrina A. Belder)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Sabrina A. Beldner in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Motion to Stay)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DIEGO AVILES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue the October 26, 2021 ...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice (of Change in Counsel for Service List)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINITFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Hearing on Demurre...))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.