Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Eagle Restorations Group Inc. A California Corporation, Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Sued As Doe 1, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Darling John, Lozano Dustin Taylor, against California Institute Of Technology A California Non-Profit Corporation, Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Sued As Doe 1, Hensel Phelps Parent 1 Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Hensel Phelps Parent 2 Inc. A Delaware Corporation, represented by Potocki Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark V. Mooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hensel Phelps Construction Co. sued as Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hensel Phelps Construction Co. sued as Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Hensel Phelps Construction Co. sued as Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Answer (OF HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO. TO COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/16/2020)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.