Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dardon Michael, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Messrelian Harout, against Matt Denny'S Ale House Restaurant, Nguyen Long, represented by Oakley Randal S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Matt Denny's Ale House Restaurant (Defendant)
Date: August 09, 2023Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Long Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Matt Denny's Ale House Restaurant (Defendant); Long Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to Continue Tria...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.