Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company A Nebraska Corporation, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Lewi Christopher C., against Smith Annette Aka Anette K. James, Smith Janet, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Annette Smith (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Annette Smith (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Annette Smith (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Annette Smith (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 21, 2020Complaint
Date: July 14, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 21, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 21, 2020Answer
Date: August 31, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: August 31, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 10, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 20, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 10, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: February 04, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement (by Defendant Annette Smith) Filed by Annette Smith (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer (of Defendant Annette Smith to Complaint) Filed by Annette Smith (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Answer (of Defendant Annette Smith to Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/12/2021)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement (by Defendant Annette Smith)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.