Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Iqal Christopher, Peters Travis, Ranksharks Inc., Ranksharks Llc, Sales Gazelle Llc A California Limited Liability Company, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Annigian Jason D. Esq., against Peters Travis, Ranksharks Inc. A Texas Corporation, Ranksharks Llc A California Limited Liability Company;, Sales Gazelle Llc A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Brandt Justin M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert Broadbelt III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Broadbelt III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 03, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER IQAL (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Order re: Application of Clark Wu for Admission PHV; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Order (re: Application of Clark Wu for Admission PHV)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Verified Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Clark Wu)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.