Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schrage Kaitlin Rose, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Infuso Daniel Vincent, against Daimler Ag, Mercedes Benz Usa Llc, represented by Rogers Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Crowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: June 29, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Mercedes Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mercedes Benz USA, LLC (Defendant); As to: Kaitlin Rose Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 29, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2020Complaint
Date: June 29, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 02, 2020PI General Order
Date: July 09, 2020Answer
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: August 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)
Date: August 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: February 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Kaitlin Rose Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Kaitlin Rose Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Kaitlin Rose Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Kaitlin Rose Schrage (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 08/06/2020)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
December 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
February 05, 2021 | Hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) | |
February 05, 2021 | Hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
February 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Non-Appearance Case Review scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case is Deemed Complete. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.