Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chakraborty An Individual Sourabh, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yazdanpanah Hesam, against Odell An Individual Dena, Odell An Individual Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 26, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2020Complaint
Date: June 26, 2020PI General Order
Date: July 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL)
Date: August 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 10, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 18, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: June 27, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Recusal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by SOURABH CHAKRABORTY, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: June 27, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by SOURABH CHAKRABORTY, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by SOURABH CHAKRABORTY, an individual (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by SOURABH CHAKRABORTY, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Recusal) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Recusal) of )
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...) of )
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Recusal) of 08/03/2020)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.