Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rivera Trucking Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Johnson J. Craig, Johnson J. Craig Esq., against Aon Risk Insurance Services West Inc. A California Corporation, Continental Casualty Company An Illinois Corporation, Federal Insurance Company A New Jersey Corporation, Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland A Maryland Corporation, Hudson Insurance Company A Delaware Corporation, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert Broadbelt III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Broadbelt III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Skanska-Traylor-Shea, a joint venture (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 10/19/2020)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/19/2020)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.