Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Reyes Marilyn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Suarez Rodrigo, against Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. Crowfoot Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Marilyn Reyes (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Request for Admissions, Set 1)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Complaint (Petition)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set 1)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Request for Production, Set 1)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/16/2020)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.